Lee et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Missy Lee, Leander Lee and ProCraft Exteriors, Inc.
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00763
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:2615
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Howell, Jennifer)
August 4, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff ProCraft Exteriors, Inc., Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Compel Appraisal by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 8/11/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/31/2020. (SMM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Compel Appraisal by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Howell, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion to compel appraisal [ECF No. #9 ] is SCHEDULED to follow immediately upon conclusion of the Rule 16 Conference set at 9:30 a.m. on September 2, 2020. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 09:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/24/2020. (CLO)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Consent: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. Unless previously submitted, no later than July 31, 2020, each party must submit to the Clerk's Office the consent/option form either consenting to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or opting to have the case assigned to a United States District Judge. 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for September 2, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/26/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/2/2020 09:30 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/31/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/24/2020. (CLO) Modified to show Rule 16 is via Zoom Video Conference on 7/24/2020 (CLO).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Under the circumstances, all three Plaintiffs are citizens of Missouri and Defendant is a citizen of Illinois. Therefore, the complete diversity among the litigants required for this Court's exercise of diversity jurisdiction exists. See OnePoint Sols., LLC, 486 F.3d at 346. Having found earlier that Plaintiffs' allegations satisfy the amount-in-controversy requirement for diversity jurisdiction and having now concluded there is complete diversity among the parties, this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this lawsuit. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/23/2020. (SMM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc. (Jadin, Alexander) Modified on 7/23/2020;corrected event from motion to response. (JAB).
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Appraisal filed by Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anthony A. Remick in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Appraisal)(Jadin, Alexander)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Appraisal by Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc.. (Jadin, Alexander)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than July 24, 2020, Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack diversity jurisdiction. (Show Cause Response due by 7/24/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/9/2020. (SMM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Brinker for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Brinker, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Deft State Farm's Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint to Demand Appraisal ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Howell, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L. Howell for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Howell, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 12, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Alexander M. Jadin. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Leander Lee, Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc. Process Server: Metro Legal (MFG)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7962516, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Missy Lee, ProCraft Exteriors, Inc., Leander Lee. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests, #4 Attachment Original Filing Form, #5 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Jadin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missy Lee
Represented By: Alexander M. Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Lee
Represented By: Alexander M. Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProCraft Exteriors, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander M. Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Howell
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?