Monday Restaurants LLC v. Intrepid Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Monday Restaurants LLC
Defendant: W.R. Berkley Corporation, Intrepid Insurance Company and Intrepid Insurance Company an Iowa corporation doing business as Intrepid Direct Insurancy
Case Number: 4:2020cv00767
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Suggestions in Support by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Navarro, Lauren) filed by W.R. Berkley Corporation, Intrepid Insurance Company ; ORDERED GRANTING Intrepid Insurance Company answer due 8/13/2020; W.R. Berkley Corporation answer due 8/13/2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/06/20. (CMH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Suggestions in Support by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Navarro, Lauren)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Navarro, Lauren)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. Parent companies: W.R. Berkley Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: W.R. Berkley Corporation,. (Navarro, Lauren)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Kenny, Patrick) filed by W.R. Berkley Corporation, Intrepid Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTING Intrepid Insurance Company answer due 8/6/2020; W.R. Berkley Corporation answer due 8/6/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 07/06/20. (CMH)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren H. Navarro for Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Navarro, Lauren)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Kenny, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny for Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Kenny, Patrick)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Intrepid Insurance Company, W.R. Berkley Corporation. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/6/2020. (CMH)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Monday Restaurants LLC. W.R. Berkley Corporation served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Cornfeld, Richard)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Monday Restaurants LLC.. (Cornfeld, Richard)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Monday Restaurants LLC. Intrepid Insurance Company served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Cornfeld, Richard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Scott Levy for Plaintiff Monday Restaurants LLC. (Levy, Daniel)
June 15, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Richard S. Cornfeld. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Monday Restaurants LLC Process Server: Connecticut Process Serving LLC (Cornfeld, Richard)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Monday Restaurants LLC Process Server: Burris Process Serving, LLC (Cornfeld, Richard)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7963812, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monday Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2019-2020 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-2021 Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Original Filing Form , #5 Summons (Intrepid Insurance Company), #6 Summons (W.R. Berkley Corporation))(Cornfeld, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monday Restaurants LLC v. Intrepid Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.R. Berkley Corporation
Represented By: Lauren H. Navarro
Represented By: Patrick J. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid Insurance Company an Iowa corporation doing business as Intrepid Direct Insurancy
Represented By: Lauren H. Navarro
Represented By: Patrick J. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monday Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?