Baker's Silicone, Inc. v. Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Baker's Silicone, Inc.
Defendant: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00799
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Matthew T. Schelp, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/7/2020. (KXS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Baker's Silicone, Inc... (Stubblefield, Kory)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of: TIME TO FILE NOTICE TO STATE COURT ACKNOWLEDGED BY THE CLERK OF THE STATE COURT, MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT ;Proposed extension date June 30, 2020 by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael) filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/20/20. (MRS)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Compel APPRAISAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF BAKER'S SILICONE, INC. TO NAME APPRAISER, AND TO STAY OR ABATE LITIGATION UNTIL COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael) filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 07/16/20. (CMH)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Compel APPRAISAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF BAKER'S SILICONE, INC. TO NAME APPRAISER, AND TO STAY OR ABATE LITIGATION UNTIL COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of: TIME TO FILE NOTICE TO STATE COURT ACKNOWLEDGED BY THE CLERK OF THE STATE COURT MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT ;Proposed extension date June 30, 2020 [SUPPLEMENTAL SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of: TIME TO FILE NOTICE TO STATE COURT ACKNOWLEDGED BY THE CLERK OF THE STATE COURT MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT ;Proposed extension date June 30, 2020 filed by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of: TIME TO FILE NOTICE TO STATE COURT ACKNOWLEDGED BY THE CLERK OF THE STATE COURT, MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT ;Proposed extension date June 30, 2020 by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Brown, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Kory D. Stubblefield. Review of case shows that Attorney Kory D. Stubblefield is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (BAK)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Baker's Silicone, Inc..(BAK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Certificate of Compliance: by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR DAMAGES by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel APPRAISAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF BAKER'S SILICONE, INC. TO NAME APPRAISER, AND TO STAY OR ABATE LITIGATION UNTIL COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL filed by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel APPRAISAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF BAKER'S SILICONE, INC. TO NAME APPRAISER, AND TO STAY OR ABATE LITIGATION UNTIL COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Parent companies: Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Subsidiaries: Seneca Insurance Company; The North River Insurance Company; United States Fire Insurance Company; Crum & Forster Holdings Corp.; Fairfax (US), Inc.; FFHL Group, Ltd., Publicly held company: Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited,. (Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Brown for Defendant Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Brown, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC02474, with receipt number AMOEDC-7973072, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 3)(Brown, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker's Silicone, Inc. v. Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker's Silicone, Inc.
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?