Hill v. Phelps County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Bilal Hasanie Hill
Defendant: Dionne Kelley, Lieutenant Joe Taylor, Sergeant Glenn, Phelps County Sheriff's Department, Sheriff Richard L. Lisenbe, Phelps County Jail, Dr. Arthur Bentley, Kelly Ratcliff, Unknown Glenn, Richard L. Lisenbe, Joe Taylor, Does 1-15 and Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00804
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint, by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., Arthur Bentley, Dionne Kelley.(Eckenrode, J.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc... (Eckenrode, J.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. waiver signed on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Eckenrode, J.)
August 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Charles C. Eblen. (NEP)
August 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: In light of plaintiff's amended complaint and the addition of a new defendant, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 20, 2020, is CANCELLED and will be re-set after the new defendant is served and files a response to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 08/13/2020. (LXC)
August 12, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint,,, Jury Demand demand, , filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. (Attachments: #1 Summons Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.)(Eblen, Charles)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill. . (Eblen, Charles)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/13/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/20/2020 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/27/2020. (NEP)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Dionne Kelley.(Eckenrode, J.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Arthur Bentley.(Eckenrode, J.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Defendant Arthur Bentley. (Eckenrode, J.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Defendant Dionne Kelley. (Eckenrode, J.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Unknown Glenn, Richard L. Lisenbe, Phelps County Jail, Phelps County Sheriff's Department, Kelly Ratcliff, Joe Taylor.(Brooks, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by John Terry Brooks for Defendants Unknown Glenn, Richard L. Lisenbe, Phelps County Jail, Phelps County Sheriff's Department, Kelly Ratcliff, Joe Taylor. (Brooks, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael G. Berry for Defendants Unknown Glenn, Richard L. Lisenbe, Phelps County Jail, Phelps County Sheriff's Department, Kelly Ratcliff, Joe Taylor. (Berry, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Charles C. Eblen for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice #19 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/13/2020. (LXC)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles C. Eblen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number CMOEDC-8004785) by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CBL)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Richard L. Lisenbe served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Kelly Ratcliff served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Joe Taylor served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Dionne Kelley served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Unknown Glenn served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Phelps County Jail served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/7/2020) (KEK).
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. Phelps County Sheriff's Department served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Gutshall, Brandon)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Brandon K. Gutshall for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 06/23/2020. (LXC)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brandon K. Gutshall. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7980059) by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill. (Attachments: #1 Attachment COGS)(Gutshall, Brandon)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Charles C. Eblen. Review of case shows that Attorney Charles C. Eblen is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
June 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 8 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Charles C. Eblen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bilal Hasanie Hill Process Server: HPS Process Service (Eblen, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7975926, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bilal Hasanie Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - Phelps County Sheriff's Department, #4 Summons Summons - Phelps County Jail, #5 Summons Summons - Sheriff Richard L. Lisenbe, Individually and in His Official Capacity as Sheriff of Phelps County, #6 Summons Summons - Dr. Arthur Bentley, Individually and in His Official Capacity as a Medical Services Provider at Phelps County, #7 Summons Summons - Dionne Kelley, #8 Summons Summons - Kelly Ratcliff, #9 Summons Summons - Sergeant Glenn, #10 Summons Summons - Lt. Joe Taylor)(Eblen, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Phelps County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionne Kelley
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Joe Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Richard L. Lisenbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps County Jail
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Arthur Bentley
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ratcliff
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Glenn
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Lisenbe
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Taylor
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: John Terry Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Hasanie Hill
Represented By: Charles C. Eblen
Represented By: Brandon Gutshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?