IT-THIS LLC v. Newport Brain Research Laboratory, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IT-THIS LLC
Defendant: WAVE NEUROSCIENCE, INC. and NEWPORT BRAIN RESEARCH LABORATORY, INC.
Counter Defendant: Nathan Meor
Case Number: 4:2020cv00844
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wave Neuroscience, Inc. Nathan Meor waiver signed on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Scott, Roger)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER of Service issued defendantNathan Meor. filed by Wave Neuroscience, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Issued to Nathan Meor)(Scott, Roger)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Wave Neuroscience, Inc.'s Motion to Add Nonparty as Counter-Defendant (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add Nathan Meor to the docket sheet as a party Counter Defendant in this action. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/20/2020. (TMT)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 IT-This LLC ANSWER to Counterclaim of Wave Neuroscience Inc by IT-THIS LLC.(Wittels, Lawrence)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wave Neuroscience, Inc. Acknowledged by Circuit Court for the County of St. Louis Sent To: State Court - Executed (Scott, Roger)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Wave Neuroscience, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff IT-THIS LLC by Wave Neuroscience, Inc..(Scott, Roger)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Add Party Motion to Add Nonparty as Counter-Defendant by Defendant Wave Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Add Nonparty as Counter-Defendant)(Scott, Roger)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff IT-THIS LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wittels, Lawrence)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff IT-THIS LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/9/2020.) (TMT)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that for all future filings, counsel must label all exhibits with both an exhibit designation (e.g., Ex. A), and a brief description of the exhibit (e.g., Petition), as required by Section II.F. of the Court's CM/ECF Procedures Manual and the instructions in red text on the filings screens. Failure to comply in future may result in the Court striking nonconforming filings for attorney error. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 26, 2020. (SMH)
June 26, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by IT-THIS LLC.(MFG)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant WAVE NEUROSCIENCE, INC. Sent To: Plaintiff (Scott, Roger)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant WAVE NEUROSCIENCE, INC.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Scott, Roger)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC02238, with receipt number AMOEDC-7985755, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by WAVE NEUROSCIENCE, INC., NEWPORT BRAIN RESEARCH LABORATORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment State Court Docket Entries, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Scott, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IT-THIS LLC v. Newport Brain Research Laboratory, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAVE NEUROSCIENCE, INC.
Represented By: Roger L. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWPORT BRAIN RESEARCH LABORATORY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IT-THIS LLC
Represented By: Lawrence B. Wittels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nathan Meor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?