Jones et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Don Jones and Lori Jones
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00845
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 ***REMARK ; Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-04837, filed 07/20/2020. (DJO)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-222) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 26, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Enrique Elliot Adler. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Don Jones, Lori Jones Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (BAK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7986268, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Don Jones, Lori Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Attachment Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Jones
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Jones
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?