Doe v. Steen et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Officer Zachary Tunison, Officer Brian Johnson, Sheriff John Cottle, Officer Eric Brotherton, Officer Jeremy Steen, John Cottle, Zachary Tunison, Brian Johnson, Jeremy Steen and Eric Brotherton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00930
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. Zachary Tunison served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (James, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. Jeremy Steen served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (James, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. Brian Johnson served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (James, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. Eric Brotherton served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (James, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Joint and Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Eric Brotherton, John Cottle, Brian Johnson, Jeremy Steen, Zachary Tunison.(Henson, D.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by D. Keith Henson for Defendants Eric Brotherton, John Cottle, Brian Johnson, Jeremy Steen, Zachary Tunison. (Henson, D.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. John Cottle served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (James, John) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/11/2020) (TMT).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Matthew T. Schelp, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/7/2020. (KXS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (James, John)
July 21, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to John D. James. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jane Doe Process Server: Lincoln County Coroner (James, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jane Doe Process Server: Lincoln County Sheriff (James, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 Plaintiff's Memo in Support of Motion to Proceed Under the Pseudonym and for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (MFG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under A Pseudonym by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (MFG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8025442, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, #4 Attachment Memo In Support of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, #5 Summons Summons to Defendant Steen, #6 Summons Summons to Defendant Tunison, #7 Summons Summons to Defendant Johnson, #8 Summons Summons to Defendant Brotherton, #9 Summons Summons to Defendant Cottle)(James, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Steen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John D. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zachary Tunison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff John Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Brotherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jeremy Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cottle
Represented By: D. Keith Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Tunison
Represented By: D. Keith Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Johnson
Represented By: D. Keith Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Steen
Represented By: D. Keith Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Brotherton
Represented By: D. Keith Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?