American Metals Supply Co., Inc. v. Landmark Technology A, LLC.
Plaintiff: American Metals Supply Co., Inc.
Defendant: Landmark Technology A, LLC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00967
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: As noticed by Plaintiff, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 09/01/2020. (KCB)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Metals Supply Co., Inc. AMENDED (Howard, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Metals Supply Co., Inc. (Howard, David)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/17/2020. (KXS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Landmark Technology A, LLC.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (CLO)
July 27, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney David Lloyd Howard. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff American Metals Supply Co., Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: None,. (Howard, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Intent To Use Process Server: by Plaintiff American Metals Supply Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Howard, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Landmark Technology A, LLC. with receipt number AMOEDC-8039056, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Metals Supply Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- '508 Patent, #2 Exhibit B- Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C- 2nd Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D- article re Landmark 4Apr2019, #5 Exhibit E- article re Landmark 21Aug2014, #6 Exhibit F- Pacer Search, #7 Exhibit G- EBay PTAB Decision, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form, #10 Summons)(Howard, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Metals Supply Co., Inc. v. Landmark Technology A, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Metals Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: David Lloyd Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Technology A, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?