Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Holmon et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: David Holmon, John Doe Entity doing business as The Lux and David Holmon Individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of JOHN DOE ENTITY d/b/a The Lux
Case Number: 4:2020cv01072
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Answer of David Holmon (TMT) Modified on 10/1/2020 (KCB).
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. David Holmon served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020; John Doe Entity served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/16/2020) (TMT). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2020) (TMT).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc... (Janis, Ryan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/24/2020. (KCB)
August 14, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Ryan R. Janis. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Process Server: Writlegal (Janis, Ryan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant David Holmon, John Doe Entity with receipt number AMOEDC-8077473, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons John Doe Entity, #3 Summons David Holmon)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Holmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Holmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity doing business as The Lux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Holmon Individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of JOHN DOE ENTITY d/b/a The Lux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?