Bowers v. KPS Locums, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: KPS Locums, Inc. and James Kendall
Case Number: 4:2020cv01074
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant KPS Locums, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/5/2020.) (TMT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Eric Bowers. KPS Locums, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Eric Bowers. James Kendall served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant KPS Locums, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/27/2020.) (TMT)
August 14, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Richard A. Voytas, Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (MFG)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Filing of A0121: by Plaintiff Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Eric Bowers Process Server: Mark Effinger (Voytas, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Eric Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8078111, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. KPS Locums, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPS Locums, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?