Gallagher v. Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Gallagher and Robert J. Gallagher
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01083
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Robert J. Gallagher. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Martin, Eric)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Plaintiff Robert J. Gallagher. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County by Plaintiff Robert J. Gallagher. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 Santander Consumer USA Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Santander Consumer USA Inc..(Martin, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Martin, Eric) filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/24/2020. (KEK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Martin, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (MCB)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Gregory D. Vescovo. Review of case shows that Attorney Gregory D. Vescovo is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Patrick J. Brickman. Review of case shows that Attorney Patrick J. Brickman is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Frank Bartela, A. Review of case shows that Attorney Frank Bartela, A is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Patrick J. Perotti. Review of case shows that Attorney Patrick J. Perotti is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Nicole T. Fiorelli. Review of case shows that Attorney Nicole T. Fiorelli is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Original Filing Form: by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Martin, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc... (Martin, Eric)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Robert J. Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MFG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Filing Civil Cover Sheet: by Defendant Santander Consumer USA Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Martin, Eric)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC03368, with receipt number AMOEDC-8081335, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A )State Court Petition), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Affidavit), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (Notice to State Court), #4 Exhibit Ex D (Filings in State Court Case))(Martin, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Gallagher
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Gregory D. Vescovo
Represented By: Nicole T. Fiorelli
Represented By: Frank Bartela, A.
Represented By: Patrick J. Brickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?