Noack v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cheryl R. Noack
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01085
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cheryl R. Noack. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/19/2020 by serving Jeffrey Jensen, U.S. Attorney, answer due 10/19/2020. (MCB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Cheryl R. Noack, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (AAT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (AAT)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 08/18/2020. (AAT)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will bemodified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: See Order For Full Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 08/18/2020. (AAT)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Cheryl R. Noack. (Severs, Traci)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cheryl R. Noack. (Severs, Traci)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Cheryl R. Noack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Andrew Saul, #4 Summons Jeffrey Jensen, #5 Summons William Barr)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noack v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl R. Noack
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?