Gunther v. St. Louis County Police Department
Plaintiff: Rex Gunther and Peter Kroner
Defendant: St. Louis County Police Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv01086
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Rex Gunther from Court re: improper service. Copy of letter mailed this date to Plaintiff via mail (ANP)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Rex Gunther re: pertinent information to this case (KEK)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE improper service: by Plaintiff Rex Gunther (ANP)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk of Court from Rex S. Gunther re: Receipt of documents. (ARL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (JMP)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rex Gunther. (JMP)
August 19, 2020 Receipt 4644088972 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Gunther, Rex (CCAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Aug 18 10:00:53 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant St. Louis County Police Department Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Rex Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunther v. St. Louis County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Gunther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Kroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?