Bush et al v. HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Breyonna Bush, India Roberson and Jayla Howard
Defendant: HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. doing business as Popeyes Chicken and Biscuits
Case Number: 4:2020cv01098
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.,Terminating Jayla Howard (Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) , filed by Breyonna Bush.(Doogan, Jessica)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin W. Prewitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8151564) by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Prewitt, Kevin) filed by HZ OPS Holdings, Inc., AND #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyson H. Ketchum. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8151575) by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. (Attachments:# 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ketchum, Tyson) filed by HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/21/2020. (KEK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyson H. Ketchum. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8151575) by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ketchum, Tyson)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin W. Prewitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8151564) by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Prewitt, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Def's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond the Class and Collective Action Complaint by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. (Brenner, Jeremy) filed by HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. answer due 10/12/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/14/2020. (KEK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Def's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond the Class and Collective Action Complaint by Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeremy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy Michael Brenner for Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeremy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A. Kaiser for Defendant HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.. (Kaiser, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica R. Doogan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8114438) by Plaintiff Breyonna Bush. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Doogan, Jessica) filed by Breyonna Bush, AND #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert E. DeRose. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8113656) by Plaintiff Breyonna Bush. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(DeRose, Robert) filed by Breyonna Bush; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/1/2020. (KEK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica R. Doogan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8114438) by Plaintiff Breyonna Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Doogan, Jessica)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert E. DeRose. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8113656) by Plaintiff Breyonna Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(DeRose, Robert)
August 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Breyonna Bush, Jayla Howard, India Roberson. All Defendants. (Riggan, Russell)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Russell C. Riggan. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Breyonna Bush, Jayla Howard, India Roberson Process Server: SB Serve LLC (BAK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel W. Moore for Plaintiffs Breyonna Bush, Jayla Howard, India Roberson. (Moore, Samuel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Breyonna Bush, Jayla Howard, India Roberson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Riggan, Russell)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-8086875, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Breyonna Bush, Jayla Howard, India Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet , #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Summons, #7 Summons NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE PROCESS SERVER)(Riggan, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush et al v. HZ OPS Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breyonna Bush
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Represented By: Jessica Doogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India Roberson
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayla Howard
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. doing business as Popeyes Chicken and Biscuits
Represented By: Kevin Prewitt
Represented By: Tyson Ketchum
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Brenner
Represented By: Robert A. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?