Borak v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jessica Borak
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01103
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jessica Borak. Defendant Andrew M. Saul (US Attorney) served on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (TMT)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (TMT)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/21/2020. (TMT)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/21/2020. (TMT)
August 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (MFG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jessica Borak. (MFG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jessica Borak. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Jessica Borak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borak v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Borak
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?