Garner v. Corizon Medical Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Defendant: Unknown CJC Superintendent, Corizon Medical Dept., Adrian Barnes, Jane Doe 1 & 2, Unknown Medical Director and Unknown Unit Manager of 4A
Case Number: 4:2020cv01104
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Oscar Garner. Returned document(s): #3 Memorandum & Order,,,. Document resent to Plaintiff at new address. (BRP)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Oscar Garner. (BRP)(Address updated in cm/ecf on 9/30/2020.) (CBL).
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Adrian Barnes, Corizon Medical Dept., Jane Doe 1 & 2, Unknown Unit Manager of 4A, filed by Oscar Garner. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(BRP)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Wed Sep 16 14:04:47 CDT 2020 (Battle, Kinica)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court's form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a certified account statement to accompany his motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for non- compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 09/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Form)(KCB)
August 20, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Aug 20 10:00:59 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (DLB)
August 20, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Oscar Garner. (DLB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Document treated as PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Corizon Medical Dept., Adrian Barnes, Unknown CJC Superintendent, Jane Doe 1 & 2, Unknown Medical Director, Unknown Unit Manager of 4A Jury Demand,, filed by Oscar Garner. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Corizon Medical Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown CJC Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1 & 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Unit Manager of 4A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?