American Automotive Solutions, Inc. v. Agruss Law Firm et al
Plaintiff: American Automotive Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Fenix Protect and American Automotive Solutions, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Fenix Protect
Defendant: dba SCAMMER.INFO John Doe no. 1, Ryker Gillespie, John Does nos. 3-50, Icehook Systems, LLC, Discord, Inc., Cameron Lobban, Cloudflare Inc., dba BOBRTC.TEL John Doe no. 2, Donald Marchant, Tucows, Agruss Law Firm, John Doe 1 doing business as Scammer.Info, John Does 3-50, Agruss Law Firm, LLC, Cloudflare, Inc. and John Doe 2 doing business as Operating BOBRTC.TEL
Case Number: 4:2020cv01114
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice its claims against Discord, Inc., ECF No. #28 , is GRANTED. (Discord, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/13/2020. (ANP)
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Automotive Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Fenix Protect, regarding Discord, Inc. (Kass, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint by Defendant Donald Marchant. (Osburn, Ted) filed by Donald Marchant ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/2/2020. (NEP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint by Defendant Donald Marchant. (Osburn, Ted)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Raymond Dunn for Defendant Donald Marchant. (Dunn, Mark)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted R. Osburn for Defendant Donald Marchant. (Osburn, Ted)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Ryker Gillespie served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Ryker Gillespie served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Donald Marchant served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Icehook Systems, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice its claims against AgrussLaw Firm, LLC, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Agruss Law Firm, LLC (an Illinois limited liability company ) terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 09/16/2020. (ANP)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Automotive Solutions, Inc. of Defendant Agruss Law Firm, LLC (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. Process Server: First Legal (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Donald Marchant served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE Memorandum Regarding Summonses to Accompany Service of Amended Complaint: by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. re #14 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons to Icehook Systems, LLC, to Accompany Service of Amended Complaint, #2 Summons to Discord, Inc. to Accompany Service of Amended Complaint, #3 Summons to Ryker Gillespie to Accompany Service of Amended Complaint, #4 Summons to Donald Marchant to Accompany Service of Amended Complaint)(Kass, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury demand, , filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kass, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Agruss Law Firm, LLC's, Rule 11 Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel, Jeffrey H. Kass: by Defendant Agruss Law Firm, LLC (Molner, Mark)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Molner for Defendant Agruss Law Firm, LLC. (Molner, Mark)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 Incorrectly filed docket entry - see entry #12 Modified on 9/8/2020 (KEK).
September 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Donald Marchant. The summons was emailed to Jeffrey Kass. (ARL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. Process Server: First Legal (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Memorandum re Amended Summons: by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. re #8 Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Summons (Amended) to Donald Marchant)(Kass, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Donald Marchant served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Discord, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Kass, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant American Automotive Solutions, Inc. The summons was emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney. (ANP)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. of Intent to Use Process Server re Amended Summonses (Kass, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Memorandum re Amended Summonses: by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Amended) to Icehook Systems LLC, #2 Summons (Amended) to Ryker Gillespie)(Kass, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc. (Kass, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 8 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jeffrey H. Kass. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc. Process Server: First Legal (MFG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendant All Defendants with receipt number BMOEDC-8091117, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Automotive Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Fenix Protect. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Form Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate, #4 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #5 Summons to be Issued to Agruss Law Firm, LLC, #6 Summons to be Issued to Icehook Systems, LLC, #7 Summons to be Issued to Discord, Inc., #8 Summons to be Issued to Ryker Gillespie, #9 Summons to be Issued to Donald Marchant, #10 Summons to be Issued to Cloudflare, Inc.)(Kass, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Automotive Solutions, Inc. v. Agruss Law Firm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dba SCAMMER.INFO John Doe no. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryker Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does nos. 3-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icehook Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discord, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Lobban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudflare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dba BOBRTC.TEL John Doe no. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Marchant
Represented By: Ted R. Osburn
Represented By: Mark Raymond Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agruss Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 doing business as Scammer.Info
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 3-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agruss Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudflare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2 doing business as Operating BOBRTC.TEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Automotive Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Fenix Protect
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Automotive Solutions, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Fenix Protect
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?