Martin v. USA
Petitioner: Kyle G. Martin
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv01161
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: supplement to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct a Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ;Proposed extension date October 26, 2020 by Petitioner Kyle G. Martin; ORDERED GRANTED. (Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/26/2020.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/31/2020. (SMM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: supplement to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct a Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ;Proposed extension date October 26, 2020 by Petitioner Kyle G. Martin. (Spearman, Katryna)
August 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Aug 27 15:00:39 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 27, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (DJO)
August 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY by Petitioner Kyle G. Martin. (DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Sirena M. Wissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle G. Martin
Represented By: Katryna Lyn Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?