Frazier et al v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jewel Frazier and Frank Frazier, Jr.
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe ApS and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv01192
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Indiana. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO105) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DLB)
September 4, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
September 4, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 3. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER of Service issued defendantCook Medical LLC. sent to registered agent Corporation Service Company on 09/03/2020 filed by Jewel Frazier, Frank Frazier, Jr. Waiver of Service due by 10/5/2020. (Kruse, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER of Service issued defendantCook Incorporated. sent to registered agent Corporation Service Company on 09/03/2020 filed by Jewel Frazier, Frank Frazier, Jr. Waiver of Service due by 10/5/2020. (Kruse, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER of Service issued defendantWilliam Cook Europe ApS. sent to Managing Director, William Cook Europe ApS on 09/03/2020 filed by Jewel Frazier, Frank Frazier, Jr. Waiver of Service due by 11/2/2020. (Kruse, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8119196, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jewel Frazier, Frank Frazier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Kruse, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier et al v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Frazier
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Frazier, Jr.
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe ApS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?