Avdagic et al v. Regency Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr Bakir Avdagic, Mrs. Mirha Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic and Bakir Avdagic
Defendant: Noah Property, LLC, Regency Management Company, LLC, Mr. Mark Stevens and Mark Stevens
Case Number: 4:2020cv01213
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Noah Property, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 11/13/2020. (KJS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2-Standard - Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/23/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/30/2020 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/3/20. (KJS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Mark Stevens only are DISMISSED without prejudice, for lack of timely service. (Mark Stevens terminated.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/3/20. (KJS)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #17 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic filed by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (Reinberg, Stephen)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 30, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Mark Stevens. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this Defendant without prejudice. (Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/23/2020. (AFC)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC. (Clark, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by William Stewart Clark, IV for Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC. (Clark, William)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (Hackney, Jeffrey) filed by Mirha Avdagic, Bakir Avdagic ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/22/2020. (JMP)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey David Hackney for Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC. (Beseau, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC. (Beseau, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Filestamped Notice to State Court, #2 Attachment State Court Entry Acknowledging Removal)(Beseau, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC Certificate of Service of Removal Papers to Plaintiffs Sent To: Plaintiff (Beseau, John)
September 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to William Stewart Clark, IV. Review of case shows that Attorney William Stewart Clark, IV is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic. (AFC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Noah Property, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Noah Property, LLC. (MFG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Bakir Avdagic, Mirha Avdagic.(MFG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Regency Management Company, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Beseau, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Regency Management Company, LLC from Saint Louis County, case number 19SL-CC04223, with receipt number AMOEDC-8129691, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Regency Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A--Petition, #2 Exhibit Ex. B--Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex. C--Noah Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. D--Stevens Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. E--State Court Docket and Legal File, #6 Exhibit Ex. E2--State Court Docket and Legal File, #7 Exhibit Ex. F--Cover Letter to Pltfs Counsel, #8 Exhibit Ex. G--Rogs, #9 Exhibit Ex. H--Bakir Depo, #10 Exhibit Ex. I--Bakir Resume, #11 Exhibit Ex. J--Mirha License Verification, #12 Exhibit Ex. K--Mirha Mercy Website, #13 Exhibit Ex. L--Party Information, #14 Exhibit Ex. M--Naim Declaration, #15 Exhibit Ex. N--Noah Property Operating Agreement, #16 Exhibit Ex. O--Steinbock Certificate of Status, #17 Exhibit pending motions, #18 Exhibit civil cover sheet, #19 Exhibit original filing form)(Beseau, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avdagic et al v. Regency Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Bakir Avdagic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Mirha Avdagic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirha Avdagic
Represented By: Stephen Cody Reinberg
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakir Avdagic
Represented By: Stephen Cody Reinberg
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Property, LLC
Represented By: William Stewart Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Management Company, LLC
Represented By: John G. Beseau
Represented By: William Stewart Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mark Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?