Noble v. Credit Control Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Noble
Defendant: Credit Control Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01410
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/16/2020. (KCD)
November 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wendy Noble (Roberts, Christopher)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference of November 20, 2020 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within sixty (60) days, up to and including December 18, 2020, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 12/18/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 21, 2020. (BRP)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Credit Control Services, Inc. (Benson, Harry)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/13/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/20/2020 10:45 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/16/2020. (TMT)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Credit Control Services, Inc..(Benson, Harry)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Credit Control Services, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - File Stamped Notice to State Court)(Benson, Harry)
October 1, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Lincoln County, filed by Wendy Noble.(MFG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Credit Control Services, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Benson, Harry)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Credit Control Services, Inc.. Parent companies: CCS Financial Services, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Benson, Harry)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Harry L. Benson for Defendant Credit Control Services, Inc.. (Benson, Harry)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County Circuit Court, case number 20L6-AC00683, with receipt number AMOEDC-8184668, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Credit Control Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Original Filing Form Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court File)(Benson, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Credit Control Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Noble
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control Services, Inc.
Represented By: Harry L. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?