Martin v. LVNV Funding LLC
Plaintiff: Pree Martin, Pree C. Martin and Pree C. Jett
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC and LVNV Funding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01414
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #31 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher E. Roberts)(Roberts, Christopher)
November 20, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
November 16, 2020 ***REMARK re #30 : The use of an attorney's electronic filing login and password to file a pleading, motion, memorandum or other document constitutes the signature of that attorney on that document for all purposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. (This document will be accepted by the Court, but for future filings please see Local Rule 11-2.11 located on the court website.) (KCD)
November 13, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC. (Morris, James)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER re #27 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/05/2020. (KCB)
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER Re: #25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin (Roberts, Christopher); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/30/2020. (BRP)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to (Circuit Court of St. Louis County) filed by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Notice of Removal, Doc. #21 , is GRANTED, in part. The Courts Order, Doc. 20 , granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal, Doc. #18 , is hereby VACATED, as it was issued in error. Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Notice of Removal, Doc. #21 , will be treated as Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal, Doc. #18 . Plaintiff is given through November 6, 2020 to file any further response to Doc. #18 and any reply to Defendants response, Doc. #17 , to Plaintiffs First Motion to Remand Case to State Court, Doc. #11 . Defendant will be given through November 13, 2020 to reply to Plaintiff's response, Doc. #21 , or to any further response or reply Plaintiff provides by November 6, 2020, pursuant to this Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/28/2020. (BRP)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend its Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Butsch, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend its Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Butsch, David)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 [VACATED] Docket Text ORDER Re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/26/2020. (TMT) Modified on 10/28/2020 (BRP).
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC. (Morris, James)
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC. (Morris, James) Modified on 10/28/2020 (BRP).
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to (Circuit Court of St. Louis County) filed by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC. (Morris, James)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher E. Roberts for Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Roberts, Christopher)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1 - 3-16-2010 Judgment, #2 Exhibit EX 2 - Mtn to Set Aside Default Judgment, #3 Exhibit EX 3 - Order Granting Mtn to Set Aside, #4 Exhibit EX 4 - Plaintiff's State Court Petition)(Morris, James)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by David T. Butsch for Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Butsch, David)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER Re: #10 CONSENT to Motion for Additional Time For Defendant To Respond to Complaint by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/9/2020. (TMT)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to (Circuit Court of St. Louis County) filed by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Butsch, David)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to (Circuit Court of St. Louis County) by Plaintiff Pree C. Martin. (Butsch, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Motion for Additional Time For Defendant To Respond to Complaint by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC.. (Morris, James) Modified on 10/9/2020 (TMT).
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (EAB)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - File Stamped Notice to State Court)(Morris, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
October 2, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (EAB)
October 2, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Pree C. Martin.(MFG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Harry L. Benson for Defendant LVNV Funding LLC. (Benson, Harry)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant LVNV Funding LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Morris, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant LVNV Funding LLC. Parent companies: Sherman Originator LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Morris, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Morris for Defendant LVNV Funding LLC. (Morris, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 4:20-cv-01414, with receipt number AMOEDC-8186068, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by LVNV Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Original Filing Form Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court File)(Morris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. LVNV Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Harry L. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Harry L. Benson
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pree Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pree C. Martin
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pree C. Jett
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?