Nail v. Saul
Plaintiff: William J Nail, Andrew M. Saul and William J. Nail
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01422
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/12/2020. (KEK)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/12/2020. (KEK)
October 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William J. Nail. (MFG)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 First Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by William J Nail. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Original Filing Form)(Schnaare, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nail v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Nail
Represented By: Stanley D. Schnaare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Nail
Represented By: Stanley D. Schnaare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?