Carter v. Stringer
Petitioner: William Carter
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Case Number: 4:2020cv01585
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk sent to Petitioner William Carter, Respondent Mark Stringer re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/17/2020. (KJS)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Thu Dec 10 10:38:45 CST 2020 (Shirley, Kelley)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-04197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
November 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (MFG)
November 5, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915; and (2) this petition for a writ of habeas corpus is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 10/27/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Willis, Kathy)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus on court-approved forms as directed by 10/9/20 order (Doc. 4 ) filed by William Carter.(Davies, Cindy)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) petitioner is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this petition on or before October 23, 2020; (2) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail petitioner a copy of this Order along with court-approved forms to prepare his petition; and (3) FAILURE OF PETITIONER TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER WARNING TO PETITIONER. Signed on 10/9/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (CLERK'S NOTE: Court-approved forms and Order mailed to Petitioner as directed.)(Willis, Kathy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by William Carter. (Willis, Kathy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Carter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A, # 4 Appendix B)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?