Forester v. Saul
Plaintiff: Richard D. Forester
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01783
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Richard D. Forester. U.S. Attorney General served. (KEK)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Richard D. Forester. Office of Regional Counsel served on January 11, 2021. (MCB)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Richard D. Forester. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. US Attorney served. (KEK)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2020. (ANP)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2020. (ANP)
December 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (ANP)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Richard D. Forester. (BAK)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard D. Forester. (Overton, Kathleen)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Richard D. Forester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)
December 16, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forester v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Forester
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?