Barton v. Saul
Plaintiff: Travis Barton
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01787
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Travis Barton. US Attorney General served. (KEK)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Travis Barton. (MCB)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Travis Barton. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. US Attorney served. (KEK)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4.. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2020. (ANP)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2020. (ANP)
December 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (ANP)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Travis Barton. (JWD)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Andrew M. Saul, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Travis Barton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Envelope)(JWD)
December 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
December 17, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 17 13:00:38 CST 2020 (admin,)
December 17, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?