Plummer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Debra Rae Plummer
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01811
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Debra Rae Plummer. (Billington, P.)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Debra Rae Plummer. (Billington, P.)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Debra Rae Plummer. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021. (Billington, P.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/21/2020. (TMT)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security with receipt number AMOEDC-8355249, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Debra Rae Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons-Andrew Saul, #4 Summons Summons-Jeffrey B. Jensen, #5 Summons Summons-Jeffrey Rosen)(Billington, P.)
December 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney P. Daniel Billington. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Rae Plummer
Represented By: P. Daniel Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?