Coleman v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leona Coleman
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Ryan Francis, John Doe and Cintas Corporation No. 2
Case Number: 4:2020cv01815
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 3/26/2021. Discovery Completion due by 11/3/2021. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2021. ADR Future Reference 8/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3N - St. Louis before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Pretrial Compliance due by 4/12/2022. Motion in Limine due by 4/22/2022. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/12/2021. (NEP)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: The Rule 16 Conference set for 02/11/2021 at 10:30 am is VACATED and a CMO will be issued. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 02/09/2021. (ANP)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Leona Coleman. . (Hoffman, Megen)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/1/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/11/2021 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 01/07/2021. (ANP)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Cintas Corporation No. 2, Ryan Francis.(Cozart, Jessica)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2. Parent companies: Cintas Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Cintas Corporation No. 3,. (Cozart, Jessica)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2 Sent To: State Court - Executed (Cozart, Jessica)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/4/2021. (ANP)
December 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Leona Coleman.(BAK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 PROTECTIVE ORDER (BAK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Leona Coleman.(BAK)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Ryan Francis Sent To: Plaintiff (Cozart, Jessica)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC01266, with receipt number AMOEDC-8355086, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Ryan Francis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Exhibit A-Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit B-State File, #5 Exhibit C-Ryan Francis Affidavit, #6 Exhibit D-Settlement Demand)(Cozart, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Coleman
Represented By: Megen I. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bolten Cozart
Represented By: Shatrasha LeighAnn Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Francis
Represented By: Jessica Bolten Cozart
Represented By: Shatrasha LeighAnn Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation No. 2
Represented By: Jessica Bolten Cozart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?