Caldwell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Paula Y. Caldwell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01848
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Paula Y. Caldwell. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security served on January 11, 2021. (MCB)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Paula Y. Caldwell. William Barr, Attorney General, served on January 7, 2021. (MCB)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General filed by Paula Y. Caldwell. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (KJS)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Paula Y. Caldwell, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (KJS)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marhsals Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KJS)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties shall have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. (See order for full details.) (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/12/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 12/22/20. (KJS)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 12/22/20. (KJS)
December 22, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Dec 22 10:01:36 CST 2020 (admin,)
December 22, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. (JWD)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paula Y. Caldwell. (JWD)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Paula Y. Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Y. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?