Henry v. Vantage Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Twanna Henry
Defendant: Dan Dolan, Mark Rudolph, Jerry Eichholz, William Soloman, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Vantage Credit Union, EH, LLC d/b/a Honda of Frontenac, Daniel Isom, Eric Acree, Toni Martin and EH, LLC doing business as Honda of Frontenac
Case Number: 4:2020cv01865
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims filed by Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Walsh, Richard)
February 19, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims by Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Richard)
February 19, 2021 Filing 24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Consent by Plaintiff Twanna Henry. (Warwick, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Vantage Defendants Responses to Class Action Complaint Pending Rulings on Motions to Compel Arbitration (Pivin, Edward) ; ORDERED GRANTED IN PART. The Court orders defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman and Vantage Credit Union to respond to the complaint no later than 10 days after the Court rules on the arbitration motions. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/16/21. (JAB)
February 12, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Vantage Defendants Responses to Class Action Complaint Pending Rulings on Motions to Compel Arbitration by Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Pivin, Edward)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: The Court Grants #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Twanna Henry. ( Response to Court due by 2/26/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/9/2021. (CBL)
February 8, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Twanna Henry. (Warwick, Brian)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant EH, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant EH, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 2/10/2021. (CLO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Vantage Credit Union. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Walsh, Richard)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant EH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Kraushaar, Corey)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Vantage Credit Union. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 2/1/2021. (JAB)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Class Action Complaint by Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Walsh, Richard) ; ORDERED GRANTED. (Eric Acree answer due 2/19/2021; Dan Dolan answer due 2/19/2021; Jerry Eichholz answer due 2/19/2021; Barbara Evans-Cunningham answer due 2/19/2021; Daniel Isom answer due 2/19/2021; Toni Martin answer due 2/19/2021; Mark Rudolph answer due 2/19/2021; William Soloman answer due 2/19/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/19/21. (JAB)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward T. Pivin for Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Pivin, Edward)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Class Action Complaint by Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Walsh, Richard)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard B. Walsh, Jr for Defendants Eric Acree, Dan Dolan, Jerry Eichholz, Barbara Evans-Cunningham, Daniel Isom, Toni Martin, Mark Rudolph, William Soloman, Vantage Credit Union. (Walsh, Richard)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Twanna Henry. EH, LLC served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Bell, Bryce)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Twanna Henry. Vantage Credit Union served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Bell, Bryce)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/7/20. (JAB)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/7/20. (JAB)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian W. Warwick. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8388606) by Plaintiff Twanna Henry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida)(Warwick, Brian)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew T. Peterson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8388521) by Plaintiff Twanna Henry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida)(Peterson, Matthew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant EH, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/19/2021. (CLO)
December 29, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryce B. Bell for Plaintiff Tawana Henry. (Bell, Bryce) Modified on 12/29/2020 (BAK).
December 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 10 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Bryce B. Bell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Twanna Henry Process Server: Notice of (Bell, Bryce)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8364631, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Twanna Henry. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Summons)(Bell, Bryce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2020: #4 Summons Vantage, #5 Summons EH, LLC, #6 Summons Evers-Cunningham, #7 Summons Dolan, #8 Summons Isom, #9 Summons Acree, #10 Summons Eichholz, #11 Summons Rudolph, #12 Summons Martin, #13 Summons Solomon) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Vantage Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Dolan
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rudolph
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Eichholz
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Soloman
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Evans-Cunningham
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Credit Union
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EH, LLC d/b/a Honda of Frontenac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Isom
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Acree
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Martin
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EH, LLC doing business as Honda of Frontenac
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanna Henry
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Brian Warwick
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?