Budco Financial Services, LLC v. VSC Now LLC et al
Plaintiff: Budco Financial Services, LLC
Defendant: David E Simpson, VSC Now LLC, Sean M Miller and William D Finley
Case Number: 4:2020cv01873
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Sean M Miller. The summons was emailed to attorney J. Talbot Sant, Jr. (JAB)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Budco Financial Services, LLC as to Sean M Miller. (Sant, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Budco Financial Services, LLC Process Server: Nicole Bucklew, Jamison Bryant, Cortney Reid (Attachments: #1 Summons - Updated - Miller)(Sant, John)
December 29, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney John Talbot Sant, Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Budco Financial Services, LLC Process Server: Robert Anderson (Sant, John)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Budco Financial Services, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sant, John)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8368350, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Budco Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - VSC Now, #7 Summons - Simpson, #8 Summons - Miller, #9 Summons - Finley)(Sant, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budco Financial Services, LLC v. VSC Now LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSC Now LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Budco Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: John Talbot Sant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?