Dixon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela M. Dixon
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00016
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela M. Dixon. Attorney General served. (KEK)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela M. Dixon. Office of Regional Chief Counsel served. (KEK)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela M. Dixon. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. United States Attorney served. (KEK)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
January 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant SSA Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USM. (ARL)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - This case is assigned to Track: 4. This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(3) and (4), Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of Plaintiffs complaint. With its answer, Defendant shall file a transcript of the record. 42 U.S.C. 405(g). See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/12/21. (ARL)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/12/21. (ARL)
January 6, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Angela M. Dixon. (BAK)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela M. Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bill, Karen)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Angela M. Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bill, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Dixon
Represented By: Karen Kraus Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?