Carr v. The American Bottling Co. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Carr
Defendant: Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper, The American Bottling Co. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper and Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper
Case Number: 4:2021cv00325
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: The Rule 16 Conference is reset for May 26, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., by telephone. The parties must file the joint proposed scheduling plan no later than May 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 05/03/21. (MCC)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Michael Carr's Motion to Remand is DENIED to the extent it seeks remand of Count II. Count I is severed from Count II, and Count I is remanded to the state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Count II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 5/3/2021. (Clerk emailed copy of this Order and docket sheet to STL County Circuit Court this date.)(AFO)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Michael Carr. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co., Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., The American Bottling Co.. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Michael Carr, Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co., Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., The American Bottling Co.. (AFO)
March 31, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co., Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., The American Bottling Co. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/7/2021. (KJS)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Rule 16 Conference is VACATED, pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 03/29/21. (MCC)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co., Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., The American Bottling Co. Sent To: State Court - Executed (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Michael Carr. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court by Plaintiff Michael Carr. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2: Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/13/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/20/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 3/23/21. (KJS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co., Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., The American Bottling Co..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Michael Carr.(BAK)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. . Parent companies: Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.; DPS Holdings, Inc.; DPS Americas Beverages, LLC; DPS Beverages Inc; A&W Concentrate Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. . Parent companies: Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.; DPS Holdings, Inc.; DPS Americas Beverages, LLC; DPS Beverages Inc; A&W Concentrate Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The American Bottling Co. . Parent companies: Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.; DPS Holdings, Inc.; DPS Americas Beverages, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. , Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. , The American Bottling Co. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment File Stamped Notice of Removal)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie C. Cohan for Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. , Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. , The American Bottling Co. (Cohan, Stephanie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeannie M. DeVeney for Defendants Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. , Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. , The American Bottling Co. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC06191, with receipt number AMOEDC-8531645, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by The American Bottling Co. , Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. , Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
March 15, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. The American Bottling Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pepper/Seven Up Manufacturing Co. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Bottling Co. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. doing business as Dr. Pepper Snapple Group and/or Keurig Dr. Pepper
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carr
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?