Lindsey v. Dow Chemical Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Kris Lindsey
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC, Grinnell, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The J.R. Clarkson Company, John Crane, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Viacom CBS, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, JP Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Johnson Consumer, Inc., PTI Union, LLC doing business as Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC formerly known as Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC, Viacom CBS Inc., Johnson & Johnson Companies, Inc., Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC, Dow Chemical Company, The, Johnson & Johnson, J.R. Clarkson Company, The, CBS Corporation, General Electric Conpany and J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00374
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Frank, Alejandro)
April 30, 2021 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleading filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Frank, Alejandro)
April 29, 2021 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant John Crane, Inc.. Parent companies: Smiths Group PLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Kris Lindsey's request for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/29/2021. (ANP)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Docket Text ORDER: As all claims against defendants Viacom, PTI, and DOW have been dismissed without prejudice, the following motions are DENIED as MOOT: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.; #25 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.; #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Extend Time to File a Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Dow Chemical Company; #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.; and #44 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/29/21. (CDP)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Docket Text ORDER: As stipulated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case as to defendant Dow Chemical Company only is dismissed without prejudice with each side to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/29/21. (CDP)
April 28, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey Request for Rule 16 Conference (Holcomb, Lawrence)
April 28, 2021 Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The. (Anderson, Charles)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Docket Text ORDER: As stipulated #50 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed as to defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation only without prejudice with each side to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/28/21. (CDP)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Pleading ;Proposed extension date 4/30/21 by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/28/21. (CDP)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Docket Text ORDER: As stipulated #59 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is as to defendant PTI Union, LLC, only is dismissed without prejudice with each side to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/28/21. (CDP)
April 27, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Pleading ;Proposed extension date 4/30/21 by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Vaughn, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 59 STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 26, 2021 Filing 58 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon David Peters for Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company, The. (Peters, Shannon)
April 26, 2021 Filing 57 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph C. Orlet for Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company, The. (Orlet, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by J.R. Clarkson Company, The.(Mueller, Brandan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company, The. Parent companies: Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, Publicly held company: Emerson Electric Co.,. (Mueller, Brandan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandan P. Mueller for Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company, The. (Mueller, Brandan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #52 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Wilke, Tyler)
April 22, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (Wilke, Tyler)
April 22, 2021 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 22, 2021 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. (Newton, Kevin)
April 12, 2021 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand demand, , filed by Kris Lindsey.(Wilke, Tyler)
April 9, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleading by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilke, Tyler)
April 6, 2021 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler Brooks Wilke for Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (Wilke, Tyler)
April 2, 2021 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc... (Frank, Alejandro)
April 2, 2021 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline)
April 2, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 2, 2021 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 2, 2021 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 31, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Kevin) Modified on 4/1/2021 - edited title (ANP).
March 31, 2021 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The.. (Anderson, Charles)
March 31, 2021 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles S. Anderson for Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The. (Anderson, Charles)
March 30, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frank, Alejandro)
March 30, 2021 Filing 37 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. Parent companies: Johnson Controls International, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Tayyab, Julia)
March 29, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frank, Alejandro)
March 29, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE Service of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc.'s Rule 26 Disclosure: by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc. (Newton, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. Publicly held company: ViacomCBS Inc.,. (Newton, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin J. Newton for Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. (Newton, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (JKL)
March 29, 2021 Filing 32 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Jeremy D. Lewis. Review of case shows that Attorney Jeremy D. Lewis is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL)
March 29, 2021 Filing 31 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Jennifer Eng. Review of case shows that Attorney Jennifer Eng is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL)
March 29, 2021 Filing 30 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Lawrence K. Holcomb. Review of case shows that Attorney Lawrence K. Holcomb is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL)
March 29, 2021 Filing 29 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Laci M. Whitley. Review of case shows that Attorney Laci M. Whitley is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Kris Lindsey. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First AMended Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Make More Definite and Certain by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss on Various Grounds, Including for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petitions, or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, or, Alternatively, for a More Definite Statement by Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Extend Time to File a Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court State of Missouri Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, filed by Kris Lindsey.(JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court State of Missouri Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, filed by Kris Lindsey.(JKL)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan for Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Melissa Ann Vaughn for Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Vaughn, Melissa)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Alejandro Patricio Frank for Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Frank, Alejandro)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CC10369, with receipt number AMOEDC-8554780, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson and Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frank, Alejandro) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/29/2021 to correct PDF error) (JKL). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2021: #5 Original Filing Form) (JKL). Modified on 3/29/2021 (JKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Dow Chemical Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, LLC
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.R. Clarkson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Eng
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC doing business as Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC formerly known as Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma-Tech Industries, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company, The
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Charles S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Clarkson Company, The
Represented By: Joseph C. Orlet
Represented By: Shannon David Peters
Represented By: Brandan P. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Conpany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Lewis
Represented By: Matthew R. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Lindsey
Represented By: Tyler Brooks Wilke
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Laci M. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?