Crawford et al v. Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Crawford and Michael Dew
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. and Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00390
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Jena M. Valdetero for Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Valdetero, Jena)
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Darnell Crawford, Michael Dew. (Garvey, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' consent motion to stay briefing on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Doc. #16 . Plaintiffs urge the Court to stay all briefing on Defendants' motion to dismiss #12 until the Court issues an order on their pending motion to remand #14 . Upon review of the parties' submissions, the Court denies Plaintiffs' motion to stay. Doc. #16 . Plaintiffs must file their response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #12 no later than June 1, 2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 5/18/2021. (CLO)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hasken, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) to Stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Darnell Crawford, Michael Dew. (Garvey, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Darnell Crawford, Michael Dew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John F. Garvey)(Garvey, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiffs Darnell Crawford, Michael Dew. (Garvey, John)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. (JMP)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hasken, Timothy)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Responsive pleading due to Court no later than April 23, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 04/06/2021. (RTS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Motion ;Proposed extension date April 23, 2021 by Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Hasken, Timothy)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Darnell Crawford, Michael Dew.(BAK)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Bay, Peter)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. Parent companies: thyssenkrupp Materials N.A., Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.. Parent companies: thyssenkrupp North America, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J. Hasken for Defendants thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2122-CC00411, with receipt number AMOEDC-8567524, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc., thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hasken, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford et al v. Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Timothy J. Hasken
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Timothy J. Hasken
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Crawford
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron D. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dew
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron D. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?