Padda et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management, Gurpreet S. Padda and Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C.
Defendant: Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Xavier Becerra, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation doing business as WPS Government Health Administrators and Liz Richter
Case Number: 4:2021cv00492
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Gurpreet S. Padda. (Grubman, Scott)
May 27, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION to Withdraw #21 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne) filed by Liz Richter, Xavier Becerra, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/20/2021. (NEP)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw #21 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
May 14, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
May 14, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiffs Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C., Gurpreet S. Padda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration)(Grubman, Scott)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Temporary Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motion for expedited discovery and a preliminary injunction hearing must be filed no later than Friday, May 14, 2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/11/2021. (NEP)
May 7, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2021. Motion for TRO denied for the reasons stated on the record. Written order to issue early next week. (Court Reporter: Carla Klaustermeier, Carla_Klaustermeier@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984) (proceedings started: 3:19 pm) (proceedings ended: 3:22 pm) (Deputy Clerk: ANP)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Scott Grubman)(Appearance for Defendant: Suzanne Moore) (ANP)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION to Seal Document by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. and #11 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne) filed by Liz Richter, Xavier Becerra, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/7/2021. (NEP)
May 6, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held via Zoom before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2021 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management, P.C., Gurpreet S. Padda. Parties present. Oral arguments heard from both sides regarding Plaintiff's motion for TRO. Matter taken under advisement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Linda Nichols, Linda_Nichols@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7983) (proceedings started: 11:11 am) (proceedings ended: 12:48 pm) (Deputy Clerk: ANP)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Scott Grubman)(Appearance for Defendant: Suzanne Moore) (ANP)
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #12 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Plaintiffs Gurpreet S. Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management, P.C.. (Grubman, Scott)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #12 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Plaintiffs Gurpreet S. Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management, P.C.. (Grubman, Scott)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation, Liz Richter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Moore, Suzanne)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Document by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redacted Memorandum)(Moore, Suzanne)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Grubman. ; ORDERED GRANTED. #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/29/2021. (NEP)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Status Conference held on 4/29/2021. The hearing scheduled for Thursday May 6, 2021 at 11:00 am will be held via zoom. (proceedings started: 1:00 pm) (proceedings ended: 1:20 pm) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Scott Grubman & Christian Dennis)(Appearance for Defendant: Suzanne Moore) (NEP)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: The Court will hold a case conference in this matter on April 29, 2021, at 1:00 p.m., by Zoom. Call-in information will be provided by email. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. [ #3 ]) is set for May 6, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Defendants shall file a response to the Motion no later than May 4, 2021. (Status Hearing set for 4/29/2021 01:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 5/6/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/28/2021. (NEP)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management, P.C. re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Grubman, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne J. Moore for Defendants Xavier Becerra, Liz Richter, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation. (Moore, Suzanne)
April 28, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Scott Grubman. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Grubman, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 Expert Statistician Report, #4 Exhibit 3 Revised Demand & Recoupment, #5 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Christian P. Dennis)(Grubman, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Grubman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8612363) by Plaintiffs Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion for Admission, #2 Letter State Letter of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing State Certificate of Good Standing)(Grubman, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-8612001, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gurpreet Padda, Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Overpayment Determination Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 Request for Redetermination, #4 Exhibit 4 Redetermination Decision, #5 Exhibit 5 Request for Reconsideration, #6 Exhibit 6 Medicare decision, #7 Exhibit 7 Expert Statistician Report, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #10 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons, #13 Summons Summons, #14 Summons Summons, #15 Summons Summons)(Grubman, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padda et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Padda
Represented By: Scott Grubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Padda Institute Center for Interventional Pain Management
Represented By: Scott Grubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurpreet S. Padda
Represented By: Scott Grubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C.
Represented By: Scott Grubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Suzanne J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Physician Service Insurance Corporation doing business as WPS Government Health Administrators
Represented By: Suzanne J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Richter
Represented By: Suzanne J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?