Williams v. Keen et al
Plaintiff: DeAngelo J. Williams
Defendant: Jane Doe 1, John Doe 3, Daniel Keen, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, John Doe 4 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 4:2021cv00534
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed May 5 17:01:21 CDT 2021 (admin,)
May 5, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JKL)
May 5, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JKL)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER[COPY AS ENTERED IN 4:20-CV-01690 RLW]: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall STRIKE plaintiff DeAngelo Williams from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, using the complaint filed in the instant case, the Clerk shall open a new prisoner civil rights case for plaintiff DeAngelo Williams, and shall randomly assign it. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the new case opened for DeAngelo Williams, the Clerk shall file a copy of this Memorandum and Order, and a copy of DeAngelo Williams' application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 4 ) and motions for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 6 and 8 ).. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on May 5, 2021. (JKL)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Deangelo J. Williams. (JKL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Deangelo J. Williams. (JKL)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Deangelo J. Williams. (JKL)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, Daniel Keen Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Deangelo J. Williams.(JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Keen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAngelo J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?