McKinnon v. Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zoe McKinnon
Defendant: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00605
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Go and Exhibit A)(Cockroft, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay the Responsive Pleading Deadline and to Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #18 ) no later than July 16, 2021, and Plaintiff shall reply no later than August 3, 2021. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than fourteen (14) days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/7/2021. (KEK)
July 2, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Unopposed Motion To Stay Defendants Responsive Pleading Deadline And To Set A Briefing Schedule On Plaintiffs Motion To Remand by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Cockroft, Andrew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Zoe McKinnon. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Zoe McKinnon. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. Parent companies: RH, Publicly held company: RH,. (Cockroft, Andrew)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew R. Cockroft. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8692528) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cockroft, Andrew) filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/11/2021. (ANP)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew R. Cockroft. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8692528) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cockroft, Andrew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/18/2021. (ANP)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Burns. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8680754) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burns, Michael) filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/08/2021. (ANP)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Compliant by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Young, Adam) filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Restoration Hardware, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/08/2021. (ANP)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION to Stay (DEFENDANT RESTORATION HARDWARE, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Young, Adam) filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc. ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/08/2021. (ANP)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Burns. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8680754) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burns, Michael)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Compliant by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Young, Adam)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Edward Ahlering. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8670667) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Thomas Edward Ahlering)(Ahlering, Thomas) filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/01/2021. (ANP)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay (DEFENDANT RESTORATION HARDWARE, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Young, Adam)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc. (NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL) Sent To: Plaintiff (Young, Adam)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Edward Ahlering. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8670667) by Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Thomas Edward Ahlering)(Ahlering, Thomas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/7/2021. (KEK)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court docket sheet. (BAK)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Zoe McKinnon.(BAK)
May 27, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Defense counsel notified to file Notice to Plaintiff of Removal (BAK)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 21SL-CC01126, with receipt number AMOEDC-8666526, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2021: #3 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinnon v. Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe McKinnon
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Young
Represented By: Michael J. Burns
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Andrew Cockroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?