Islamovic v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Hajrija Islamovic
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00635
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General filed by Hajrija Islamovic. (KCD)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Regional Chief Counsel filed by Hajrija Islamovic. (TMT)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Hajrija Islamovic. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (KCD)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KCD)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: four [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/03/2021. (KCD)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 [Document DELETED as it is a duplicate of Order #4 ] ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/03/2021. (KCD) Modified on 6/4/2021 (BRP).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/03/2021. (KCD)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Hajrija Islamovic. (BAK)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Hajrija Islamovic. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Hajrija Islamovic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
June 3, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islamovic v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hajrija Islamovic
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?