Robinson IV v. Mehling et al
Plaintiff: Anson Noland Robinson IV
Defendant: Timothy Durbin and Anthony Mehling
Case Number: 4:2021cv00693
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk from plaintiff re: status of case. (JAB)(Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff on 8/3/21)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-04111. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
June 15, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jun 15 12:01:13 CDT 2021 (admin,)
June 15, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
June 15, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JWD)
June 15, 2021 Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 6/8/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Anson Noland Robinson IV. (Willis, Kathy)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Anson Noland Robinson IV. (Willis, Kathy)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anson Noland Robinson IV. (Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson IV v. Mehling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Mehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anson Noland Robinson IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?