Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries v. United States
Plaintiff: Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 4:2021cv00740
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Fischer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8818428) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fischer, David) filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/19/21. (ARL)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Fischer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8818428) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fischer, David)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice S. Starling Marshall.The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8791044) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marshall, Sarah) filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/03/2021. (ANP)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice S. Starling Marshall. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8791044) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marshall, Sarah)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Blair. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785813) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blair, David) filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries, AND #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dwight N. Mersereau. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785599) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mersereau, Dwight) filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/30/2021. (KEK)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Blair. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785813) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blair, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dwight N. Mersereau. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785599) by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mersereau, Dwight)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries.. (Potts, Jonathan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/2/2021. (ANP)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with receipt number AMOEDC-8715923, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Internal Revenue Service)(Potts, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Jonathan B. Potts. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Scripts Holding Company and Subsidiaries
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Represented By: David Blair
Represented By: David J. Fischer
Represented By: Dwight Mersereau
Represented By: Sarah Starling Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?