Little Omega v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Plaintiff: Little Omega
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply, Corteva Inc., BASF Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., CHS Inc., Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., Bayer CropScience L.P., Bayer CropScience Inc, Syngenta Corporation, Cargill, Inc. and Winfield Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00742
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO)
June 23, 2021 Filing 77 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00297. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO)
June 21, 2021 Filing 76 CONDITION TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-MDL No. 2993) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri in regard to MDL No. 2993. (amv)
June 3, 2021 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 18, 2021 Filing 74 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on 05/06/2021, before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe, Telephone number 618-482-9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (skr)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER STAYING CASE: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/17/2021. (mlp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
May 17, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.. (McCluggage, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held via video teleconference on 5/13/2021 re #13 Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Counsel speaking on behalf of plaintiff were Jamie Boyer, Victoria Sims, and Connor Lemire. Counsel speaking on behalf of defendants were Sharon Rosenberg and Erick VanDorn. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 12, 2021 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winfield Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Land O'Lakes, Inc. for Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Eimer, Nathan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah H. Catalano on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Catalano, Sarah)
May 12, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Chang on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Chang, Brian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa G Jacobsen on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
May 12, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Eimer, Nathan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Winfield Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 10, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #61 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., #60 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd. Documents stricken per filers request. Filed in error.(ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2021 Filing 61 STRICKEN MEMORANDUM in Support re #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony Van Burgsteden, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Anthony Van Burgsteden)(McCluggage, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2021 (ack).
May 10, 2021 Filing 60 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.. Responses due by 6/14/2021 (McCluggage, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2021 (ack).
May 10, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. McCluggage on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd. (McCluggage, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt D. Basil on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Basil, Matt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Martin, Craig)
May 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C. Martin on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Martin, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Growmark, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/6/2021. Counsel speaking on behalf of plaintiff were Don Barrett, Jamie Boyer, and Derek Brands. Counsel speaking on behalf of defendants were Adam Hemlock and Christopher Hohn. Court discussed deadline for pending motions to dismiss and whether to proceed with initial disclosures, ESI protocol, and protective order. Issues taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Univar Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. BASF Corporation waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Cargill, Inc. waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bach on behalf of BASF Corporation. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hemlock on behalf of BASF Corporation. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Osborn on behalf of CHS Inc. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lender on behalf of BASF Corporation. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lara Bueso Bach $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4472149 by on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Bach, Lara)
May 5, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam C. Hemlock $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4472118 by on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Hemlock, Adam)
May 5, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathy L. Osborn $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4472115 by on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
May 5, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J. Lender $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4472091 by on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Lender, David)
May 5, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin G. Harvey on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Harvey, Edwin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby A. Kingsbury on behalf of CHS Inc. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul Mishkin on behalf of Syngenta Corporation. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Little Omega. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 3, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul S. Mishkin $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4468986 by on behalf of Syngenta Corporation. (Mishkin, Paul)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric J. Mahr on behalf of Defendant Cargill, Inc. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill, Inc.. (Mahr, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4468142 by on behalf of Cargill, Inc.. (Mahr, Eric)
April 28, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. McCaffrey on behalf of Tenkoz Inc. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenkoz Inc.. (Peifer, Lee)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lee Peifer and granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney James McGibbon, both on behalf of Defendant Tenkoz Inc. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James R. McGibbon $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4464754 by on behalf of Tenkoz Inc.. (McGibbon, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee A. Peifer $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4464651 by on behalf of Tenkoz Inc.. (Peifer, Lee)
April 26, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
April 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Corteva Inc. (Flack, Donald)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan W. Cuneo on behalf of Plaintiff Little Omega. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan W. Cuneo $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4458004 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Consent Motion for Order to Set the Bayer CropScience Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline. The Bayer CropScience Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before May 17, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/16/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Order to Set the Bayer CropScience Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victoria Sims on behalf of Plaintiff, Little Omega. (tba)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victoria R. Sims $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4448079 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Sims, Victoria)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon B. Rosenberg on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Rosenberg, Sharon)
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Hohn, Christopher)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(VanDorn, Erick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience LP identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience LP. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick E. VanDorn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-297-NJR. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns and #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CHS Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Corteva Inc., Growmark, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience LP, Tenkoz Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., BASF Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Cargill, Inc.. Originals mailed to Attorney John (Don) W. Barrett for service. (ack)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4431275 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Katherine)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4430529 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Starns, Sarah)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John (Don) W. Barrett on behalf of Little Omega (Barrett, John (Don))
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Little Omega. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-297-GCS. Consent due by 4/7/2021 (ack)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill, Inc., Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., Growmark, Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4429814.), filed by Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BASF Corporation, #3 Summons Bayer CropScience Incorporated, #4 Summons Bayer CropScience LP, #5 Summons Cargill, Inc, #6 Summons CHS Incorporated, #7 Summons Corteva Inc, #8 Summons Federated Co-Operatives Ltd, #9 Summons GROWMARK, Incorporated, #10 Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, #11 Summons Simplot AB Retail, #12 Summons Syngenta Corporation, #13 Summons Tenkoz Inc, #14 Summons Univar Solution, #15 Summons Winfield Solutions, LLC)(Barrett, John (Don))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Omega v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: Lara Bach
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: David J. Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Lee A. Peifer
Represented By: James Robert McGibbon
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Edwin G. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Edwin G. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Sarah H. Catalano
Represented By: Brian Chang
Represented By: Vanessa G. Jacobsen
Represented By: Sarah Catalano
Represented By: Brian Yanlang Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Omega
Represented By: Victoria R. Sims
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?