DeKrey v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Plaintiff: Brad DeKrey
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Bayer CropScience L.P., Bayer CropScience Inc, Syngenta Corporation, Growmark FS, LLC and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00744
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
June 24, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO)
June 23, 2021 Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00639. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO)
June 22, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #75 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #75 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #70 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB)
May 25, 2021 Filing 75 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brad DeKrey . (Cialkowski, David)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Hemlock for BASF Corporation.; granting #67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Lender for BASF Corporation.; granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lara Bach for BASF Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 5, 2021 Filing 72 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael L. McCluggage and Barack S. Echols as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
May 5, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lara Bach. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729680 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until ten days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. See In re Crop Inputs Antitrust Litig., MDL No. 2993. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/5/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd..(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 68 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #61 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd..(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Lender. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729666 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 66 Declaration of Anthony Van Burgsteden in Support of #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Hemlock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729648 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathy L. Osborn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8728849 filed by CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
May 5, 2021 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Westerman on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Schwingler on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Schwingler, Peter)
May 5, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Woodruff on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Woodruff, Jon)
May 4, 2021 Filing 54 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Syngenta Corporation. (Long, James)
May 4, 2021 Filing 53 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Wind on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Fee on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 4, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jevon Bindman on behalf of Syngenta Corporation. (Bindman, Jevon)
May 3, 2021 Filing 49 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Brad DeKrey Regarding Venue Motions. (Cialkowski, David)
April 30, 2021 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #47 Stipulation. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Filing 47 STIPULATION re Pretrial Order No. 1 by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. Jointly Signed by All parties. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER in Response to (47 in 0:21-cv-00543-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (25 in 0:21-cv-00970-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (24 in 0:21-cv-00996-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00681-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00719-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (63 in 0:21-cv-00433-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (92 in 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (45 in 0:21-cv-00404-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (41 in 0:21-cv-00685-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (58 in 0:21-cv-00475-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (48 in 0:21-cv-00462-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (44 in 0:21-cv-00639-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs may file a letter response to Defendants' letter by Monday, May 2, 2021. 2. If the parties are unable to agree on the scheduling or procedure governing the anticipated omnibus motion to transfer and the status of the pending individual motions to transfer venue, the parties shall direct those disagreements to Magistrate Judge Leung for a ruling. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/30/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
April 29, 2021 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc. Regarding Venue Motions. (Jensen, Richard)
April 28, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Hashmall on behalf of Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 42 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (MMP).
April 28, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C Miesen on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Davida Sheri McGhee on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (McGhee, Davida)
April 27, 2021 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by X. Kevin Zhao on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 26, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Chow on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 21, 2021 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. filed by Brad DeKrey. No summons requested. (Cialkowski, David)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/20/2021. (EB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 19, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/6/2021. (EB)
April 5, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Growmark Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Stilson, Jaime)
April 2, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime)
March 31, 2021 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
March 30, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Growmark FS, LLC served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Tenkoz, Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. CHS Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Federated Co-Operatives Ltd. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Univar Solutions, Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Winfield Solutions, LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Syngenta Corporation served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. BASF Corporation served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Cargill Incorporated served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Corteva, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Bayer Cropscience, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad DeKrey. Bayer Cropscience LP served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Cialkowski, David)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/15/2021. (HAM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Motion to Extend Response Deadlines #7 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Lindsay, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-639 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/8/2021.(MMP)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hart L. Robinovitch, E. Powell Miller, Sharon S. Almonrode, William Kalas, Dennis A. Lienhardt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-639 SRN/BRT. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8575870) filed by Brad DeKrey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cialkowski, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeKrey v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Mary Fee
Represented By: Lara Bach
Represented By: Todd A Wind
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Lindsay
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Represented By: F Matthew Ralph
Represented By: F. Matthew Ralph
Represented By: Michael A. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Dufresne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Woodruff
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan C Miesen
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P.
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: James J. Long
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark FS, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Lindsay
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Represented By: F Matthew Ralph
Represented By: F. Matthew Ralph
Represented By: Michael A. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad DeKrey
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Alyssa J. Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?