Lizama v. Victorias Secret Stores, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Lizama
Defendant: Victorias Secret Direct, LLC and Victorias Secret Stores, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00763
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Todd Helvie)(Snider, Colin)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Snider, Colin) filed by Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC ; DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING AUGUST 13, 2021 TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO REMAND AND PLAINTTIFF IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING AUGUST 30, 2021 TO FILE A REPLY. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 9, 2021. (MCB)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Snider, Colin)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Abraham Lizama. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Abraham Lizama. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. Parent companies: IB US Retail Holdings, Inc.,. (Snider, Colin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (KXS)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition within fourteen (14) days of the Court ruling on Plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 7/6/2021. (KBL)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT MOTION to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Snider, Colin) Modified on 7/2/2021 (TMT).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin P. Snider for Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Snider, Colin)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/4/2021. (KCD)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Abraham Lizama.(BAK)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal Sent To: Plaintiff (Potts, Jonathan)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 21SL-CC02221, with receipt number CMOEDC-8720567, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Victorias Secret Direct, LLC, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - docket sheet, #2 Exhibit B - civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit C - original filing form)(Potts, Jonathan)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizama v. Victorias Secret Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victorias Secret Direct, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Represented By: Colin P. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victorias Secret Stores, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Represented By: Colin P. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Lizama
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?