Zayas et al v. Energizer Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Zayas, Catalina Ocampo and Deborah Jean
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Playtex Products, Inc, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC and Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00797
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Energizer Holdings, Inc., Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
August 24, 2021 Filing 20 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. (KXS)
August 20, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/27/2021. (KCD)
August 13, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against defendant Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC,Terminating Energizer Holdings, Inc. (FIRST), filed by Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas.(Wise, Brandon)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Stipulation (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before August 13, 2021. Defendants' shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before August 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/21/2021. (KBL)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint and Request for Leave by Plaintiffs Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas. (Wise, Brandon) Modified on 8/11/2021 (BRP).
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Energizer Holdings, Inc.. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: Blackrock, Inc. and Fidelity Management & Research Company,. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Playtex Products, Inc. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Edgewell Personal Care Company. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: Blackrock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group, Inc.,. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Edgewell Personal Care, LLC. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (McCurdy, Megan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (McCurdy, Megan)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 7/29/2021. (KBL)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Energizer Holdings, Inc., Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (McCurdy, Megan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Megan Anne McCurdy for Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Energizer Holdings, Inc., Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (McCurdy, Megan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by John W. Moticka for Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Energizer Holdings, Inc., Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Moticka, John)
July 27, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/6/2021.) (TMT)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #5 ) filed by Gary M. Klinger, counsel for Plaintiffs, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Gary M. Klinger is hereby admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 7/13/2021. (KBL)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gary M. Klinger. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8750611) by Plaintiffs Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A (COGS))(Klinger, Gary)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Energizer Holdings, Inc., Playtex Products, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/16/2021.) (TMT)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Wise, Brandon)
July 2, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Brandon Michael Wise. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8734253, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Deborah Jean, Catalina Ocampo, Lisa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons , #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Wise, Brandon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2021: #8 Summons) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayas et al v. Energizer Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playtex Products, Inc
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Company
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care, LLC
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Zayas
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catalina Ocampo
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Jean
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?