Potzner v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Plaintiff: George Potzner
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P., Bayer CropScience Inc, Corteva Inc., Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Syngenta Corporation, Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., CHS Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., Growmark Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. and Tenkoz Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00813
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SEP et al.(Echols, Barack)
July 6, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00535. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri and MDL 2993 In Re: Crop Inputs Antitrust Litigation.(lmb)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). (lmb)
June 24, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Cargill, Incorporated waiver sent on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Federated Co-Operatives Ltd. waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Corteva Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Bayer CropScience LP waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Bayer CropScience, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Growmark Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 Waiver of Service Executed filed by George Potzner. Stricken per filer's request due to incorrect dates entered. Filer will re-file the documents. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Bayer CropScience LP waiver sent on 6/20/2021, answer due 8/19/2021; Bayer CropScience, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw).
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw).
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Growmark Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw).
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw).
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Winfield Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CHS Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld on behalf of George Potzner. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4497027 by on behalf of George Potzner. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Fegan on behalf of George Potzner (Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-00535-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4493476.), filed by George Potzner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fegan, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potzner v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Potzner
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?