Ackerman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Thomas P Ackerman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00814
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Attachments: #1 transcript 1, #2 transcript 2, #3 transcript 3, #4 transcript 4, #5 transcript 5, #6 transcript 6, #7 transcript 7, #8 transcript 8, #9 transcript 9, #10 transcript 10)(Rund, Jane)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Andrew M. Saul.(Rund, Jane)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Kelsey Young ;substituted for:Kathleen Overton by Plaintiff Thomas P Ackerman. (Young, Kelsey) filed by Thomas P Ackerman ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Kathleen E. Overton terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/18/2021. (CLO)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Kelsey Young ;substituted for:Kathleen Overton by Plaintiff Thomas P Ackerman. (Young, Kelsey)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Attorney General filed by Thomas P Ackerman. (CLO)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Office of Regional Counsel) filed by Thomas P Ackerman. (JAB)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Thomas P Ackerman, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (LNJ)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas P Ackerman. Defendant Andrew M. Saul (US Attorney) served on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (LNJ)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were hand delivered to USMS. (JAB)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days after their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed. R. Civ. P., Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days after service of Plaintiffs complaint. Along with his answer Defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant is GRANTED leave to file the transcript of the administrative record under seal. See Local Rule 13.05(B)(1)(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/6/21. (JAB)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/6/21. (JAB)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Patrick Ackerman. (Overton, Kathleen)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Thomas Patrick Ackerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)
July 6, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P Ackerman
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?