Walsh v. Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Case Number: 4:2021cv00902
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment in this case is entered in favor of Plaintiff Martin Walsh, the Secretary of Labor, and against Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the November 2020 election conducted by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters is VOID. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant shall conduct a new election under the supervision of Plaintiff, the Secretary of Labor, and in accordance with the constitution and bylaws of Defendant insofar as they are not inconsistent with the provisions of 29 U.S.C. 48184. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the parties shall file a status report with the Court, no later than by February 6, 2023. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff, upon completion of the supervised election, promptly certify to the Court the names of the persons elected. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/8/2022. (TMT)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. #26 , is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. #23 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the November 2020 election is void and a new election is ordered under the supervision of the Secretary of Labor. The court will retain jurisdiction of this matter until a new election is held. The parties are directed to file a status report within ninety (90) days of this Memorandum and Order. A separate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. (Status Report due by 2/6/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/8/2022. (TMT)
October 24, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Willa Moorman)(Wolfe, Gary)
October 24, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Statement of Material Facts re #25 Statement of Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger) Modified on 10/25/2022 (TMT).
October 24, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - Reports of Interview)(Keller, Roger)
October 17, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #25 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Wolfe, Gary) Modified on 10/17/2022 (TMT).
October 17, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FEC Member Affidavits)(Wolfe, Gary) Modified on 10/17/2022 (TMT).
October 17, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re #28 Statement of Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
October 17, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Deposition of Robert Kersting, #2 Exhibit L - Deposition of Tracy Shanker, #3 Exhibit M - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions to Defendant)(Keller, Roger)
September 26, 2022 Filing 28 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Wolfe, Gary)
September 26, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fair Election Commitee Members)(Wolfe, Gary)
September 26, 2022 Filing 26 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Wolfe, Gary)
September 26, 2022 Filing 25 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
September 26, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Christopher Tongay, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Exhibit 2 - Missouri Teamsters, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Perry Smith, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition of Larry Sprinkle, #5 Exhibit E - Deposition Exhibit 5 - Membership Meeting Agenda, November 2020, #6 Exhibit F - Deposition of Warren Oberdieck, #7 Exhibit G - Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H - Deposition of Willa Moorman, #9 Exhibit I - Deposition of Sharon R. Jordan, #10 Exhibit J - Statement of Christopher Tongay)(Keller, Roger)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the the parties' Joint Motion to Amend, Doc. #21 , is GRANTED and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon good cause shown: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Discovery Completion due by 8/26/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/3/2023. Motion in Limine due by 1/13/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 7/18/2022. (TMT)
July 18, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Case Management Order,, by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
May 12, 2022 Filing 20 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: McCarter, W. Dudley. Date of Conference: 05122022. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(McCarter, W.)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER Re: #18 Joint MOTION to Continue Date for Completing Mediation by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 4/18/2022. (TMT)
April 18, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue Date for Completing Mediation by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: McCarter, W. Dudley Neutral selected by parties. (cc: Neutral)(TMT)
March 9, 2022 Filing 16 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh Neutral: McCarter, W. Dudley Date of Conference: April 26, 2022 time: 9:00 a.m. Location: Mediator's Office(Keller, Roger)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Nicholas P. Llewellyn ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/2/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 5/16/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 3/21/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on March 1, 2022. (BRP)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two Motion to Join Parties due by 2/25/2022. Discovery Completion due by 7/22/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2022. ADR Future Reference 3/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/3/2023. Motion in Limine due by 1/13/2023. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/09/2021. (KCD)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp:Rule 16 Conference held on 12/9/2021. Court reporter not present. Conference held via Zoom. The Court hears from the parties. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 10:04 am) (proceedings ended: 10:11 am) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Roger Keller)(Appearance for Defendant: Brian Spector) (TMT)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian A. Spector for Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (TMT)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to reschedule the Rule 16 Conference, Doc. #10 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/7/2021. (TMT)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Wolfe, Gary)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. . (Wolfe, Gary)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/7/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/24/2021. (KCD)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Parent companies: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wolfe, Gary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters.(Wolfe, Gary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Gary S. Wolfe for Defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Wolfe, Gary)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Roger A. Keller, Jr for Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Keller, Roger)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Martin J Walsh Process Server: Hurst Investigation Services, Inc. (JKL)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Nicholas P. Llewellyn. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 688, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Gary S. Wolfe
Represented By: Brian A. Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?