Gardner v. AMF Bowling Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pam Gardner
Defendant: AMF Bowling Center, Inc. doing business as Bowlero Lakeside, Bowlero Corporation and Leiserv, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00999
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference is RESCHEDULED for October 26, 2021, at 2:30 PM by Zoom. The Zoom log information remains the same. Except as set forth above, the previously entered Order Setting Rule 16 Conference shall remain in effect. (Rule 16 Conference RESET for 10/26/2021 02:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/6/2021. (JMP)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously-vacated Rule 16 conference is RESET for October 6, 2021, at 11:30 AM by Zoom. The conference will not be on the record. Participants are directed to use the following Zoom log in information: Meeting ID: 161 444 0464; Password: 973200. All participants are directed to add their name (right click and select Rename) to their profile upon entering the Zoom hearing. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Rule 16 Conference set for 10/6/2021 11:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/29/2021. (AFO)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (CMC)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this case to another Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 9/28/21. (EAB)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, September 30, 2021, at 10:30 AM is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 27, 2021. (JMR)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Pam Gardner. . (Etzkorn, Kevin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants AMF Bowling Center, Inc., Bowlero Corporation, Leiserv, LLC, Plaintiff Pam Gardner. (EAB)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/23/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/30/2021 10:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on August 24, 2021. (MCB)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendants AMF Bowling Center, Inc., Bowlero Corporation, Leiserv, LLC Notice of Removal from State Court Executed (Tranen, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Pam Gardner to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/30/2021. (CBL)
August 16, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants AMF Bowling Center, Inc., Bowlero Corporation, Leiserv, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/23/2021. (CBL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Leiserv, LLC.(Tranen, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Bowlero Corporation.(Tranen, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by AMF Bowling Center, Inc..(Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (CBL)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Pam Gardner.(BAK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Leiserv, LLC. Parent companies: Bowlero Corporaton and AMF Bowling Center, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Bowlero Corporation,. (Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bowlero Corporation. Parent companies: Bowlero Corporaton and AMF Bowling Center, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Bowlero Corporation,. (Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant AMF Bowling Center, Inc., d/b/a Bowlero Lakeside. Parent companies: Bowlero Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Bowlero Corporation,. (Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants AMF Bowling Center, Inc., d/b/a Bowlero Lakeside, Bowlero Corporation, Leiserv, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-CC03128, with receipt number AMOEDC-8804131, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Leiserv, LLC, Bowlero Corporation, AMF Bowling Center, Inc., d/b/a Bowlero Lakeside. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Tranen, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. AMF Bowling Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Gardner
Represented By: Kevin P. Etzkorn
Represented By: Kevin Etzkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMF Bowling Center, Inc. doing business as Bowlero Lakeside
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlero Corporation
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiserv, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?