Overland v. Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Talon Overland, Daniel Murphy, Mike Baker, Paul Jones, Jordan Haynes, Marcus Tripplett, Micah Mueller, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie, Chris Ewers, Dustin Vincent, Kurtis E. Paine, Brendon Norelius, Thomas Sollars, Bobby Thomad, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Nicholas D. Cardona, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Jason Everly, Bradley D. Evans, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Albert Garza, Jr., Daniel Gallegos, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael . Johnson, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Dylan Wright, Sean Tucker, Hossam Yacob, John D. Phillips, Richard Walker and John Hamilton
Defendant: Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC, Benton Odom and Eric Atchley
Case Number: 4:2021cv01008
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF FLSA SETTLEMENT AND CONSOLIDATION: The Court orders the following: 1. For settlement purposes, the above-captioned lawsuit is consolidated with the Overland lawsuit, styled Overland v. Synergies3, Tec Services, LLC, Benton Odom, and Eric Atchley; SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/26/21. (JAB)
August 12, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (LNJ)
August 11, 2021 Filing 63 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-00447. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
August 11, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (JWD)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion to Transfer Case Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
August 10, 2021 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Missouri; (mgr)
August 6, 2021 Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, John Hamilton, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Desai, Reena)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER, that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal ora motion for FLSA settlement approval on or before September 1, 2021. Should the parties require additional time to finalize their settlement agreement, they should inform the Court by filing a motion.re #59 Advisory to the Court,,,, filed by Bobby Thomad, Shawn Williams, George White, Kyron Walker, Nicholas Click, Mike Baker, Craigory Wardley, Timothy Workman, James E. Nye, Jaime A. Pena, Daniel Olson, Bradley D. Evans, Nicholas D. Cardona, Talon Overland, Brendon Norelius, Albert Garza, Jr., John Hamilton, Thomas H. Batulis, Marcus Tripplett, Eric Houston, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, John A. Hurayt, II, Joseph Harris, Eugene Barrett, Thomas Sollars, Hunter Merryman, George Lopez, Charles Dawson, Jordan Haynes, James D. Ewing, Christian Scott Starling, Daniel Murphy, Dylan Wright, Chris Ewers, Daniel Gallegos, Lucas Holmes, Kurtis E. Paine, Brandon Moyers, Eric Hammond, Leonard Lambright, Hossam Yacob, Justin Tarver, Matthew Grange, Theodore Herskovits, Jason Everly, Sean Tucker, Neyo Wylie, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Brett Guercio, Dustin Vincent, Micah Mueller, Richard Walker, Bradley Faulker, Erik Rodriguez, Jeff Gutierrez, Paul Jones, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING without prejudice #48 Motion to Compel entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer, based on the representations in the #59 Joint Advisory. Should the parties for some reason need to revisit the issues in the #48 Motion to Compel, that relief may be requested by motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 59 ADVISORY TO THE COURT, NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, John Hamilton, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob . (Desai, Reena) Modified on 7/7/2021 (wg).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, that on or before July 6, 2021, the parties shall meaningfully confer and file another joint advisory updating the Court on the status of their settlement negotiations and whether a hearing on the Motion, Dkt. No. 48, is still necessary. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
June 25, 2021 Filing 57 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, John Hamilton, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob . (Desai, Reena)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER --IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the June 24, 2021 hearing is CANCELLED. On or before midnight CST on June 25, 2021, the parties shall meaningfully confer and file another joint advisory updating the Court on the status of their settlement negotiations and whether a hearing on the Motion, Dkt. No. 48, is still necessary. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
June 17, 2021 Filing 55 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Eric Atchley, Benton Odom, Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC . (Aldis, Jay)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING re #48 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Bobby Thomad, Shawn Williams, George White, Kyron Walker, Nicholas Click, Mike Baker, Craigory Wardley, Timothy Workman, James E. Nye, Jaime A. Pena, Daniel Olson, Bradley D. Evans, Nicholas D. Cardona, Talon Overland, Brendon Norelius, Albert Garza, Jr., John Hamilton, Thomas H. Batulis, Marcus Tripplett, Eric Houston, Richard Israel, John D. Phillips, Michael. Johnson, John A. Hurayt, II, Joseph Harris, Eugene Barrett, Thomas Sollars, Hunter Merryman, George Lopez, Charles Dawson, Jordan Haynes, James D. Ewing, Christian Scott Starling, Daniel Murphy, Dylan Wright, Chris Ewers, Daniel Gallegos, Lucas Holmes, Kurtis E. Paine, Brandon Moyers, Eric Hammond, Leonard Lambright, Hossam Yacob, Justin Tarver, Matthew Grange, Theodore Herskovits, Jason Everly, Sean Tucker, Neyo Wylie, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Brett Guercio, Micah Mueller, Richard Walker, Dustin Vincent, Bradley Faulker, Erik Rodriguez, Jeff Gutierrez, Paul Jones, Set Motion Hearing for #48 MOTION to Compel Discovery ( Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 53 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, John Hamilton, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, John D. Phillips, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob, re #48 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff Bobby Thomad, Plaintiff Shawn Williams, Plaintiff George White, Plaintiff Kyron Walker, Plaintiff Nicholas Click, Plaintiff Mike Baker, Plaintiff Craigory Wardley, Plaintiff Timothy Workman, Plaintiff James E. Nye, Plaintiff Jaime A. Pena, Plaintiff Daniel Olson, Plaintiff Bradley D. Evans, Plaintiff Nicholas D. Cardona, Plaintiff Talon Overland, Plaintiff Brendon Norelius, Plaintiff Albert Garza, Jr., Plaintiff John Hamilton, Plaintiff Thomas H. Batulis, Plaintiff Marcus Tripplett, Plaintiff Eric Houston, Plaintiff Richard Israel, Neutral John D. Phillips, Plaintiff Michael. Johnson, Plaintiff John A. Hurayt, II, Plaintiff Joseph Harris, Plaintiff Eugene Barrett, Plaintiff Thomas Sollars, Plaintiff Hunter Merryman, Plaintiff George Lopez, Plaintiff Charles Dawson, Plaintiff Jordan Haynes, Plaintiff James D. Ewing, Plaintiff Christian Scott Starling, Plaintiff Daniel Murphy, Plaintiff Dylan Wright, Plaintiff Chris Ewers, Plaintiff Daniel Gallegos, Plaintiff Lucas Holmes, Plaintiff Kurtis E. Paine, Plaintiff Brandon Moyers, Plaintiff Eric Hammond, Plaintiff Leonard Lambright, Plaintiff Hossam Yacob, Plaintiff Justin Tarver, Plaintiff Matthew Grange, Plaintiff Theodore Herskovits, Plaintiff Jason Everly, Plaintiff Sean Tucker, Plaintiff Neyo Wylie, Plaintiff Shannon Correll, Plaintiff Terrence Davis, Plaintiff Brett Guercio, Plaintiff Micah Mueller, Plaintiff Richard Walker, Plaintiff Dustin Vincent, Plaintiff Bradley Faulker, Plaintiff Erik Rodriguez, Plaintiff Jeff Gutierrez, Plaintiff Paul Jones (Coleman, Helen)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
June 1, 2021 Filing 51 Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eric Atchley, Benton Odom, Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC, re #48 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff Bobby Thomad, Plaintiff Shawn Williams, Plaintiff George White, Plaintiff Kyron Walker, Plaintiff Nicholas Click, Plaintiff Mike Baker, Plaintiff Craigory Wardley, Plaintiff Timothy Workman, Plaintiff James E. Nye, Plaintiff Jaime A. Pena, Plaintiff Daniel Olson, Plaintiff Bradley D. Evans, Plaintiff Nicholas D. Cardona, Plaintiff Talon Overland, Plaintiff Brendon Norelius, Plaintiff Albert Garza, Jr., Plaintiff John Hamilton, Plaintiff Thomas H. Batulis, Plaintiff Marcus Tripplett, Plaintiff Eric Houston, Plaintiff Richard Israel, Neutral John D. Phillips, Plaintiff Michael. Johnson, Plaintiff John A. Hurayt, II, Plaintiff Joseph Harris, Plaintiff Eugene Barrett, Plaintiff Thomas Sollars, Plaintiff Hunter Merryman, Plaintiff George Lopez, Plaintiff Charles Dawson, Plaintiff Jordan Haynes, Plaintiff James D. Ewing, Plaintiff Christian Scott Starling, Plaintiff Daniel Murphy, Plaintiff Dylan Wright, Plaintiff Chris Ewers, Plaintiff Daniel Gallegos, Plaintiff Lucas Holmes, Plaintiff Kurtis E. Paine, Plaintiff Brandon Moyers, Plaintiff Eric Hammond, Plaintiff Leonard Lambright, Plaintiff Hossam Yacob, Plaintiff Justin Tarver, Plaintiff Matthew Grange, Plaintiff Theodore Herskovits, Plaintiff Jason Everly, Plaintiff Sean Tucker, Plaintiff Neyo Wylie, Plaintiff Shannon Correll, Plaintiff Terrence Davis, Plaintiff Brett Guercio, Plaintiff Micah Mueller, Plaintiff Richard Walker, Plaintiff Dustin Vincent, Plaintiff Bradley Faulker, Plaintiff Erik Rodriguez, Plaintiff Jeff Gutierrez, Plaintiff Paul Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Aldis, Jay)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have, as requested, until Tuesday, June 1, 2021, to file their response, if any, to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery filed on May 20, 2021 (docket #48). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
May 27, 2021 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Eric Atchley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aldis, Jay)
May 20, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, John Hamilton, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, John D. Phillips, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of H. Clara Coleman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Desai, Reena)
April 29, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, John D. Phillips, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Richard Walker, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Desai, Reena)
March 9, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, John D. Phillips, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob (Attachments: #1 Consent (1))(Desai, Reena)
February 2, 2021 Filing 45 ADR Report Filed - (Joint) by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, John D. Phillips, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie, Hossam Yacob(Desai, Reena)
February 1, 2021 Filing 44 Defendants' ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,,,, . Attorney Jay Aldis added to party Eric Atchley(pty:dft), Attorney Jay Aldis added to party Benton Odom(pty:dft) by Eric Atchley, Benton Odom, Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC.(Aldis, Jay)
December 1, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jeff Gutierrez, Eric Hammond, Joseph Harris, Jordan Haynes, Theodore Herskovits, Lucas Holmes, Eric Houston, John A. Hurayt, II, Richard Israel, Michael. Johnson, Paul Jones, Leonard Lambright, George Lopez, Hunter Merryman, Brandon Moyers, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, James E. Nye, Daniel Olson, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Thomas Sollars, Christian Scott Starling, Justin Tarver, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Sean Tucker, Dustin Vincent, Kyron Walker, Craigory Wardley, George White, Shawn Williams, Timothy Workman, Dylan Wright, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Eugene Barrett, Thomas H. Batulis, Nicholas D. Cardona, Nicholas Click, Shannon Correll, Terrence Davis, Charles Dawson, Bradley D. Evans, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, James D. Ewing, Bradley Faulker, Daniel Gallegos, Albert Garza, Jr, Matthew Grange, Brett Guercio, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Thomas Sollars, Bobby Thomad, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
November 16, 2020 Filing 42 2nd AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Atchley, Benton Odom, Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC amending #6 Amended Complaint., filed by Jaime A. Pena, Erik Rodriguez, Nicholas Click, Charles Dawson, Brendon Norelius, Neyo Wylie, George Lopez, Daniel Murphy, Brett Guercio, Eric Houston, Eric Hammond, Nicholas D. Cardona, Micah Mueller, Daniel Gallegos, Bradley Faulker, John A. Hurayt, II, Dustin Vincent, James D. Ewing, Thomas H. Batulis, Paul Jones, Kurtis E. Paine, Albert Garza, Jr, Kyron Walker, Richard Israel, Craigory Wardley, Lucas Holmes, Michael. Johnson, Brandon Moyers, Bobby Thomad, Theodore Herskovits, Timothy Workman, Jason Everly, Chris Ewers, Eugene Barrett, George White, Leonard Lambright, Mike Baker, Matthew Grange, Joseph Harris, Talon Overland, Bradley D. Evans, Shannon Correll, Christian Scott Starling, Thomas Sollars, Dylan Wright, Daniel Olson, James E. Nye, Hunter Merryman, Justin Tarver, Shawn Williams, Jordan Haynes, Marcus Tripplett, Terrence Davis, Jeff Gutierrez.(wg)
November 13, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Thomas Sollars, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
November 11, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (docket #34) is GRANTED such that plaintiff may traditionally file Plaintiffs Collective Complaint, asproposed in Exhibit A attached to the motion for leave, on or before November 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING re #36 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by Talon Overland, Brendon Norelius, Jordan Haynes, Marcus Tripplett, Neyo Wylie, Mike Baker, Timothy Workman, Daniel Murphy, Dustin Vincent, Chris Ewers, Micah Mueller, Kurtis E. Paine, Paul Jones, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 1/28/2021, Discovery due by 5/27/2021,, Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2021,) The trial date will be determined at a later date by the Court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
October 27, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Pending Mediation by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Desai, Reena)
October 27, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by Reena I. Desai (Desai, Reena)
October 20, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Brendon Norelius, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Atchley Depo Excerpts), #3 Exhibit C (Odom Depo Excerpts), #4 Proposed Order)(Desai, Reena)
September 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Helen Clara Coleman). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Reena I. Desai). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachhana T. Srey for H. Clara Coleman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13871966) by on behalf of Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie. (Srey, Rachhana)
August 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachhana T. Srey for Reena I. Desai ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13871941) by on behalf of Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Kurtis E. Paine, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie. (Srey, Rachhana)
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Marcus Tripplett, Dustin Vincent, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 10/30/2020,, Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2020,, Discovery due by 2/26/2021,, Joinder of Parties due by 10/20/2020,, Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020,)The trial date will be determined at a later date by the Court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Aldis, Jay)
July 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Chris Ewers, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Marcus Tripplett, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Mike Baker, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Marcus Tripplett, Timothy Workman, Neyo Wylie (Attachments: #1 Consent (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Micah Mueller, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Marcus Tripplett (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (2))(Srey, Rachhana)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within the earlier of (90) days after any defendant has been served or (60) days after any defendant has appeared., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC.(Aldis, Jay)
June 24, 2020 Set Deadlines: Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC Answer due date extended until 06/29/2020. (cd)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (cd)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aldis, Jay)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland, Marcus Tripplett (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Talon Overland as to Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. Waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Srey, Rachhana)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Jay E. Eidsness; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500054006. (wg)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by (Jay E. Eidsness) on behalf of Mike Baker, Jordan Haynes, Paul Jones, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland. (wg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Mike Baker, Paul Jones, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachhana T. Srey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 500053927) by on behalf of Mike Baker, Paul Jones, Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland. (wg) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/23/2020) (wg).
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Daniel Murphy, Talon Overland (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (2))(Srey, Rachhana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Talon Overland (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC amending, filed by Talon Overland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to atty: Rachhana T. Srey, in reference to Plaintiff, Talon Overland. (wg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to atty; Jay Eidsness in reference to Plaintiff Talon Overland. (wg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (wg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Talon Overland. (Srey, Rachhana)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #0542-13441151), filed by Talon Overland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 9, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
April 9, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overland v. Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talon Overland
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Murphy
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Baker
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jones
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Haynes
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Tripplett
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Mueller
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Workman
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neyo Wylie
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ewers
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Vincent
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurtis E. Paine
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Norelius
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sollars
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Thomad
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Barrett
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Batulis
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Click
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Correll
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D. Cardona
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Davis
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dawson
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Everly
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley D. Evans
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Ewing
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Faulker
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Garza, Jr.
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gallegos
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Grange
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Guercio
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Gutierrez
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hammond
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Harris
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Herskovits
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Holmes
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Houston
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Hurayt, II
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Israel
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael . Johnson
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lambright
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lopez
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Merryman
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Moyers
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Nye
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Olson
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime A. Pena
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Rodriguez
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Scott Starling
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Tarver
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyron Walker
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigory Wardley
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George White
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Williams
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Wright
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Tucker
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossam Yacob
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Walker
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hamilton
Represented By: Helen Coleman
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Represented By: Jay R. Aldis
Represented By: Jordan T. Kindred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton Odom
Represented By: Jay R. Aldis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Atchley
Represented By: Jay R. Aldis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?